|
08/24/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 190, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6206.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5167.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5163.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|