|
07/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 145, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5045.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5127.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|