|
09/05/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 262, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/05/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 15. Page 6489.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 5335.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 12. Page 5128.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|