|
09/23/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 714, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6854.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5763.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5472.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4554.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|