Assembly | 04/26/2018 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2018 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2018 | Read first time. To print. |