California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2485 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2018

Amended

Bill June 26, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018