California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2487 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2018

Amended

Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill May 17, 2018
Bill April 26, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018