Assembly | 04/25/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Coms. on C. & C. and P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2018 | Read first time. To print. |