California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2495 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 5, 2018

Amended

Bill June 28, 2018
Bill June 7, 2018