|
09/23/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2018
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/09/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 5237.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 7. Page 5253.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|