|
09/22/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 679, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5703.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5430.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|