|
09/18/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 493, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 7003.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5967.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2018
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5437.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|