California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2528 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Amended

Bill July 3, 2018
Bill June 14, 2018
Bill April 24, 2018
Bill April 4, 2018