|
10/03/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 437, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3208.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Page 3206.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2712.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/07/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1491.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|