California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2018

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill April 3, 2018
Bill March 15, 2018