California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2552 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill June 12, 2018
Bill April 18, 2018