Assembly | 04/25/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | Read first time. To print. |