Assembly | 04/23/2018 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | Read first time. To print. |