Assembly | 02/01/2018 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2017 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gipson. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 10). | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2017 | Read first time. To print. |