California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 24, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2018

Amended

Bill June 14, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018
Bill March 22, 2018