|
09/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 584, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 6141.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 5664.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 5664.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5380.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|