Assembly | 06/04/2018 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Reyes. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2018 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5363.) | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | Read first time. To print. |