Senate | 06/07/2018 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5482.) | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 25). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | Read first time. To print. |