California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2639 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 17, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018