Assembly | 04/16/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2018 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 10). | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | Read first time. To print. |