California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2674 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 7, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill June 14, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018
Bill April 2, 2018
Bill March 21, 2018