|
09/14/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 392, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2018
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5290.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5487.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|