|
09/30/2018
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5443.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2018
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|