California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2691 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2018

Amended

Bill August 17, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018
Bill March 20, 2018