|
09/26/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 767, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 6982.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5567.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4827.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|