California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2697 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2018

Amended

Bill August 21, 2018
Bill August 6, 2018
Bill June 18, 2018
Bill May 25, 2018
Bill April 17, 2018