Assembly | 05/31/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5642.) | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2018 | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5641.) | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2018 | Read first time. To print. |