|
08/24/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 202, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5167.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2018
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5132.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2018
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|