Senate
|
08/08/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5381.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|