|
10/12/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 689, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3119.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2518.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1715.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2017
|
From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry. To Third Reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|