|
09/06/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 284, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6358.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5285.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5300.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2018
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|