|
09/01/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 185, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2677.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/17/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2073.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1389.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|