Senate | 08/16/2018 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/06/2018 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2018 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 19). | ||
Senate | 06/07/2018 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5490.) | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 25). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |