Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED., JUD., and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1389.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/15/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/09/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/02/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|