|
09/23/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 719, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5608.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5383.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|