Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. | ||
Assembly | 02/02/2017 | Read first time. To print. |