California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2780 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 7, 2018

Chaptered

Bill August 20, 2018

Amended

Bill June 11, 2018
Bill April 25, 2018