Senate | 08/31/2018 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Jackson. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2018 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2018 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2018 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26). | ||
Senate | 05/24/2018 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5133.) | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 2). | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |