|
03/29/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 4, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 644.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 378.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (February 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2017
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 312.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|