|
06/01/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 21, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4189.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4637.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|