California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2821 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2018

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2018

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2018

Amended

Bill June 11, 2018
Bill March 22, 2018