|
09/18/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 498, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6840.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5816.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2018
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4901.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|