|
09/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 822, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6870.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5824.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2018
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5533.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2018
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2018
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2018
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2018
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|