06/28/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 57, Statutes of 2018. | |||
06/28/2018 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 06/19/2018 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4664.). | ||
Senate | 06/07/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2018 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 6). | ||
Senate | 05/30/2018 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2018 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5213.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 9). | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |