Assembly | 05/31/2018 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 5661.). | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2018 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2018 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2018 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Read first time. To print. |